EP4029478 - HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE SPINAL FUSION CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L&K Biomed Co., Ltd. 201 16-25 Dongbaekjungang-ro 16beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17015 / KR | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Gook Jin 2dong 907ho, 187, Garak-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05664 / KR | 02 /
AHN, Youngbo 927 Somerville Irvine, California 92620 / US | 03 /
LEE, Sang Soo 709dong 403ho, 68, Gwanpyeong-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14102 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Sun Kak 1dong 102ho, 238-9, Marudeul-gil, Opo-eup Gwangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12797 / KR | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 19945039.6 | 12.11.2019 | [2022/29] | WO2019KR15339 | Priority number, date | KR20190112746 | 11.09.2019 Original published format: KR 20190112746 | [2022/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049711 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029478 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61F2/30, A61F2/46 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
A61F2/4455 (EP,KR);
A61F2/447 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (KR);
A61F2/30771 (US);
A61F2/4425 (US);
A61F2/4611 (EP,KR);
A61F2002/30281 (EP);
A61F2002/30329 (EP);
A61F2002/30383 (EP);
A61F2002/30387 (EP);
A61F2002/3039 (EP);
A61F2002/30398 (EP);
A61F2002/30405 (EP);
A61F2002/30537 (EP,KR);
A61F2002/3055 (US);
A61F2002/30556 (EP);
A61F2002/30579 (EP,KR);
A61F2002/30617 (EP);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30904 (EP);
A61F2002/443 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | HÖHENVERSTELLBARER WIRBELSÄULENFUSIONSKÄFIG | [2022/29] | English: | HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE SPINAL FUSION CAGE | [2022/29] | French: | CAGE DE FUSION VERTÉBRALE RÉGLABLE EN HAUTEUR | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | Translation filed | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.04.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2017143507 (FLOWER ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0085] , [0086] , [0103] , [0107]; figures 9-18 * [A] 8; | [XA]US2017224505 (BUTLER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0032] , [0041]; figures 14,23,24 * [A] 8; | [XA]WO2018200507 (LIFE SPINE INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraph [0041]; figures 14,61,70 *[A] 8 | International search | [Y]US2003074064 (GERBEC DANIEL E [US], et al) [Y] 8 * See paragraphs [0053]-[0074]; and figures 1-4C. *; | [XY]US2017224505 (BUTLER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0082]; claims 1-20: and figures 1-70. * [Y] 8; | [A]US2017224397 (GRIMBERG EDWARD JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-10* See entire document. *; | [A]WO2018002715 (EIT EMERGING IMPLANT TECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * See entire document. *; | [A]US2019021868 (LUDWIG STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See entire document. * | by applicant | US6176882 | US9034041 | US2017258060 |