EP4029301 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD PERFORMED THEREIN FOR HANDLING COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRENGER, Pål Enskiftesgatan 8 583 34 Linköping / SE | 02 /
LARSSON, Erik G Jäbbarpsgränd 2 586 63 Linköping / SE | 03 /
BJÖRNSON, Emil Folkparksvägen 172 126 77 Hägersten / SE | 04 /
HEDEREN, Jan Nartomta Storgård 1 585 62 Linghem / SE | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19945276.4 | 13.09.2019 | [2022/29] | WO2019SE50868 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049987 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029301 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/00, H04B7/0413, H01Q1/00, H01Q3/00, H04W16/28, // H04B7/06 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | H04W16/00, H04B7/0413, H01Q1/00, H01Q3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND DARIN AUSGEFÜHRTES VERFAHREN ZUM HANDHABEN VON KOMMUNIKATION | [2022/29] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD PERFORMED THEREIN FOR HANDLING COMMUNICATION | [2022/29] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ MIS EN OEUVRE DANS CELUI-CI POUR TRAITER UNE COMMUNICATION | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018034166 (HINMAN BRIAN L [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 1-4 *[I] 3,8,9; | [XI]US2019252763 (VERMES JONATHAN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] * * figures 2C, 4A, 5D, 6A * [I] 3,8,9 | International search | [Y]US2016128023 (GUSTAVSSON ANDERS [SE], et al) [Y] 2, 7 * ; paragraphs [0012]-[0024] *; | [XD]WO2018103897 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [XD] 1,3-6,8-11 * ; whole document *; | [XY]WO2019101290 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1, 3-6, 8-11 * ; page 19, line 14 - line 21; page 25, line 9 -line 12; page 26, line 10 - line 24; figures 9B,18,19,20,21; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2, 7; | [E]WO2020078537 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1-11 * ; whole document *; | [E]WO2020130902 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1-11* ; whole document *; | [A] - GIOVANNI INTERDONATO, "Signal Processing Aspects of Cell -Free Massive MIMO", hesis No. 1817, Linköping University, (20180921), pages 1 - 35, XP055586414 [A] 1-11 * ; whole document * | [A] - GIOVANNI INTERDONATO et al., "Ubiquitous Cell -Free Massive MIMO Communications", arXiv.org, (20180410), XP080869269 [A] 1-11 * ; whole document * | [A] - JESUS RODRIGUEZ SANCHEZ et al., "Decentralized Massive MIMO Processing Exploring Daisy- chain Architecture and Recursive Algorithms", arXiv.org, (20190508), XP081586753 [A] 1-11 * ; whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2020.2964496 | by applicant | US2018034166 | US2019252763 |