EP4015944 - AIR CONDITIONER AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Carrier Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-Cho Saiwai-Ku Kawasaki-Shi Kanagawa 212-8585 / JP | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA Ken c/o Toshiba Carrier Corporation, 336, Tadehara Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-8521 / JP | 02 /
HAMASHIMA Tetsuma c/o Toshiba Carrier Corporation, 336, Tadehara Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-8521 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU Katsuhiro c/o Toshiba Carrier Corporation, 336, Tadehara Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-8521 / JP | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 19945504.9 | 17.09.2019 | [2022/25] | WO2019JP36328 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021053710 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015944 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25B47/02, F25B6/02, F25B13/00, F25B49/02 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,KR);
F25B47/02 (KR);
F24F11/89 (US);
F24F11/42 (US);
F24F3/065 (US);
F25B47/025 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP);
F25B49/027 (EP);
F25B5/02 (US);
F25B6/02 (KR);
F24F2140/12 (US);
F25B2313/005 (EP);
F25B2313/023 (KR);
F25B2313/0233 (EP,US);
F25B2313/025 (KR);
F25B2313/0251 (EP);
F25B2313/0253 (US);
F25B2400/075 (EP);
F25B2600/0253 (EP);
F25B2700/1931 (US);
F25B2700/1933 (US);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | F25B47/02, F25B6/02, F25B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/25] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER AND CONTROL METHOD | [2022/25] | French: | CLIMATISEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | Translation filed | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 22.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07332815 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2001355933 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [Y]JP4948016B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2019154321 (TAKENAKA NAOFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0043] , [0093] - [0097]; figure 1 * [I] 2-8 | International search | [YA]JPH07332815 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1, 4, 6-9 * , 0011, 1 * [A] 2-3, 5; | [Y]JP2001355933 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [Y] 8 * , 003 0, 1 *; | [YA]JP2007271094 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1, 4, 6-9 * , 001 9 -0020,0024-0028, 1-3 * [A] 2-3, 5; | [A]JP2014211251 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)[A] 1-9; | [A]WO2017006596 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 | by applicant | JP2008025901 |