EP4032084 - NOISE GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CADWALLADER, Ryan Henry 1 Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Bryers LLP Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19946053.6 | 20.09.2019 | [2022/30] | WO2019US52179 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054973 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4032084 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178, H04R1/10, H04R1/08 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04R1/1083 (EP,US);
G10K11/17857 (EP,US);
G10K11/17873 (EP);
G10K11/17881 (US);
H04R1/083 (EP);
H04R1/1008 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | G10K11/178, H04R1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | RAUSCHGENERATOR | [2022/30] | English: | NOISE GENERATOR | [2022/30] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE BRUIT | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 25.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1020867 (KUJIRADA MASANOBU) [X] 1-3,11,15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009]; figures 1-3 *[I] 4-10,12-14 | International search | [Y]US5457751 (SUCH RONALD W [US]) [Y] 15 * , fig. 7, col. 7-8 *; | [Y]US5598158 (LINZ ALFREDO R [US]) [Y] 3 * , col. 21, 46, fig 20, abstract *; | [Y]JP2005250389 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [Y] 2, 11-13, 15 * , fig. 3-4, [0029] *; | [A]JP2015187694 (KDDI CORP)[A] 1-15; | [Y]US2016217781 (ZHONG XUAN [US], et al) [Y] 13 * , fig. 4b, 6a *; | [YA]WO2017120104 (PLANTRONICS [US]) [Y] 1-3, 11-13, 15 * , [0020]-[0021], [0030], [0034], [0039] * [A] 4-10, 14; | [Y]JP2018018042 (INNOVATION LAB INC) [Y] 1-3 * , fig. 1-2, Ref. no. 7, [0023] * |