EP4037263 - NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yuichi c/o NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Tatsunori c/o NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | 03 /
MORI, Manami c/o NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | 04 /
IIZUKA, Atsushi c/o NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Broderick, Terence Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19946603.8 | 24.09.2019 | [2022/31] | WO2019JP37390 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021059353 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037263 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0806, H04L41/0895, H04L45/02, H04L45/586, H04L41/5051, // H04L41/0894, H04L41/22, H04L43/045, H04L43/0876 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L12/4641 (US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/5051 (EP);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/586 (EP,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L41/22 (EP);
H04L41/5077 (EP);
H04L43/045 (EP);
H04L43/0876 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | H04L12/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | NETZWERKSYSTEM | [2022/31] | English: | NETWORK SYSTEM | [2022/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | Translation filed | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 03.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2015052525 (RAGHU JAGANNATH N [US]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0073]; figures 19A-21B * [A] 3-7; | [I]US2016337179 (RAO RAVINDRA JN [US]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0213]; figures 1-16 *; | [IA]US2017171158 (HOY JEFFREY ROBERT [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0184]; figures 4-10 *[A] 3-7; | [I]WO2019140486 (MEGAPORT SERVICES PTY LTD [AU]) [I] 1-4,6,7 * page 1, line 4 - page 22, line 10; figures 3-8 * | International search | [X]JP2017524290 (EQUINIX, INC.) [X] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0028], [0033]-[0054], [0072], fig. 1, 2, 3A, 3B, 4 *; | [A]JP2018092565 (NTT COMM CORP) [A] 1-7* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2018092565 |