EP3937175 - DRAM MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changxin Memory Technologies, Inc. Room 630 Haiheng Building No. 6 Cuiwei Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Hefei Anhui 230000 / CN | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Kangling Room 630, Haiheng Building No.6, Cuiwei Road Economic And Technological Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230000 / CN | 02 /
SHANG, Weibing Room 630, Haiheng Building No.6, Cuiwei Road Economic And Technological Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Hongwen Room 630, Haiheng Building No.6, Cuiwei Road Economic And Technological Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230000 / CN | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
JI, Kangling Hefei, Anhui 230000 / CN | ||
02 /
SHANG, Weibing Hefei, Anhui 230000 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Hongwen Hefei, Anhui 230000 / CN | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 19946694.7 | 24.12.2019 | [2022/02] | WO2019CN127862 | Priority number, date | CN201910904496 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910904496 | [2022/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021056887 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3937175 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3937175 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/02, G11C5/06, G11C11/409, G11C11/407, // G11C7/18, G11C8/14, G11C11/408, G11C11/4097 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G11C5/025 (EP);
G11C11/403 (CN,US);
G11C11/4087 (EP,US);
G11C11/4063 (CN);
G11C5/063 (EP);
G11C11/4097 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G11C11/403, G11C11/4063 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAM-SPEICHER | [2022/02] | English: | DRAM MEMORY | [2022/02] | French: | MÉMOIRE DRAM | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2021 | Translation filed | 04.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 19.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6081450 (NAWAKI MASARU [JP]) [A] 1-8* column 5, line 24 - column 8, line 29; figure 1 *; | [XAI]US6448602 (SAKASHITA NARUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 32; figures 1-5 * [A] 5,6 [I] 4,7,8; | [IA]US2010142246 (OKAHIRO TETSUAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * [A] 6 |