04.09.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.05.2024 |
First examination report |
|
25.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.05.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.12.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
18.10.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
14.10.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
14.10.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
30.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
12.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
01.07.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
01.07.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
24.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|