Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021059469 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP38099 | 27.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7461961B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2024 | B2 | JPWO2021059469 | 01.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP38099 | 27.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114430935 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP38099 | 27.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4037440 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2022 | A4 | EP4037440 | 03.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP38099 | 27.09.2019 |