EP4040837 - TERMINAL AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOKAWA, Tomoki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
KAKISHIMA, Yuichi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
TAKADA, Takuma c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 19947559.1 | 03.10.2019 | [2022/32] | WO2019JP39222 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021064974 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040837 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H04B7/088 (EP,US);
H04B7/0632 (EP);
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/32] | English: | TERMINAL AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2022/32] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | Translation filed | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 29.07.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - CATT, "Work plan for RRM requirements for CSI-RS based L3 measurement", 3GPP TSG-RAN4#92 Meeting R4-1908403, (20190816), vol. RAN WG4, XP051771385 [A] 1-5 * , whole document whole document * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "RRM rewuirements for CSI-RS based L3 measurement", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting #92 R4-1908594, (20190816), vol. RAN WG4, XP051771545 [A] 1-5 * , whole document whole document * | [T] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "Delay requirements of CSI-RS based L3 measurement", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting #92-Bis R4-1911275, (20191004), vol. RAN WG4, XP051793564 [T] 1-5 * , whole document whole document * | by applicant | - 3GPP TS 38.214 |