EP4042742 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HOP-BY-HOP FLOW CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Beijing) Limited 6 Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Lianhai Room 902, Building 5 Xibahebeili Chaoyang District Beijing 100028 / CN | 02 /
LÖHR, Joachim Paracelsusweg 28 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
BASU MALLICK, Prateek Jakob-heil-str. 51 63303 Dreieich / DE | 04 /
SHI, Jie Room 504, Unit 8, Building 2 Zhi Xue Yuan Xi Er Qi Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Haiming Room 201, Unit 8, Building 2 Yang Guang Li Jing Huang Si Street 23 Xicheng District Beijing 100011 / CN | 06 /
HAN, Jing Room 2102, B-208 Building Guang Qu Road 28 Chaoyang District Beijing 100024 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 19948471.8 | 10.10.2019 | [2022/33] | WO2019CN110340 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068158 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042742 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/02, H04L47/10 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H04W28/0284 (EP,US);
H04W28/0273 (US);
H04L47/29 (EP);
H04W28/0289 (EP,US);
H04W28/12 (EP);
H04W40/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H04W28/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HOP-BY-HOP-FLUSSSTEUERUNG | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HOP-BY-HOP FLOW CONTROL | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMMANDE DE FLUX HOP-BY-HOP | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]WO2019190650 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [E]EP3966965 (LENOVO BEIJING LTD [CN]); | US2022232414 [ ] (WU LIANHAI [CN], et al); |