EP4044708 - LINK FAILURE DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Ruixiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Shengyu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
GUAN, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 19948965.9 | 14.10.2019 | [2022/33] | WO2019CN111064 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021072602 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044708 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/00, H04B7/02, H04B17/309, H04W72/04, H04W76/18, H04W36/30, H04W24/08, H04B7/06, H04L5/00, H04W24/10, H04W76/19 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04B17/309 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W76/18 (EP);
H04B17/24 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H04W72/00, H04B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON VERBINDUNGSAUSFÄLLEN | [2022/33] | English: | LINK FAILURE DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAILLANCE DE LIAISON | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | Translation filed | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018302889 (GUO LI [US], et al); | [X]US2019081691 (NAGARAJA SUMEETH [US], et al); |