EP4048507 - DETERMINING BUILD PARAMETERS IN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ MARTIN, Sergio Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 02 /
FREIRE GARCIA, Manuel Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 03 /
FERNANDEZ AYMERICH, Ismael Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19950150.3 | 21.10.2019 | [2022/35] | WO2019US57231 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080557 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048507 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y40/20, B33Y50/00, B33Y50/02, B29C64/386, B29C64/393, B22F10/60 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B29C64/393 (EP);
B29C64/386 (EP,US);
B22F10/60 (EP);
B33Y40/20 (EP);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP);
G05B19/4099 (US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B29C64/165 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/85, B22F10/60 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | B29C64/393, B33Y40/20, B29C64/379, B33Y50/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON BAUPARAMETERN BEI DER GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2022/35] | English: | DETERMINING BUILD PARAMETERS IN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2022/35] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE CONSTRUCTION DANS LA FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 05.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2019160526 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) | International search | [A]WO2016196382 (VELO3D INC [US]); | [A]US2018001567 (JUAN FERNANDO [ES], et al); | [A]US2018215100 (NGUYEN VU THUA [AU], et al) | by applicant | WO2019160526 |