EP4054232 - CELL MEASUREMENT METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Zhe No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang' an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 19951215.3 | 01.11.2019 | [2022/36] | WO2019CN115144 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021082009 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054232 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W36/30, H04W72/04, H04B7/185, H04W36/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04W36/0094 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04B7/1853 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W56/0015 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | H04W24/10, H04W36/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | ZELLENMESSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2022/36] | English: | CELL MEASUREMENT METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE CELLULE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | Translation filed | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2019160266 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 6,13 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0084]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-5,7-12,14,15; | [XY]US2019306734 (HUANG DINHWA [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,14,15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0095]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3,5-7,11-13; | [A]WO2019193125 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15* page 6, line 14 - page 29, line 18; figures 1-8 *; | [YA] - CATT, "Measurement Issues for NTN System", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chongqing, P.R.China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191003), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1912157 MEASUREMENT ISSUES FOR NTN SYSTEM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107bis/Docs/R2-1912157.zip R2-1912157 Measurement Issues for NTN System.docx, (20191003), XP051803772 [Y] 3,5,7,11,12 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4,6,8-10,13-15 |