EP4073989 - NON-ZERO INSERTION BASED MODULATION SCHEME FOR LOW PEAK AVERAGE POWER RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIN, Yu ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YU, Guanghui ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
HUA, Jian ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
XU, Jin ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
XU, Jun ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 19952719.3 | 13.12.2019 | [2022/42] | WO2019CN125216 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021093073 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4073989 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04L27/2614 (EP);
H04L27/2615 (KR,US);
H04L27/2053 (KR);
H04L27/2621 (US);
H04L27/2627 (EP);
H04L27/2631 (US);
H04L27/3411 (US);
H04W52/0258 (EP);
H04L1/0059 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | MODULATIONSSCHEMA AUF NICHT-NULL-EINFÜGUNGSBASIS FÜR EIN NIEDRIGES DURCHSCHNITTLICHES SPITZENLEISTUNGSVERHÄLTNIS | [2022/42] | English: | NON-ZERO INSERTION BASED MODULATION SCHEME FOR LOW PEAK AVERAGE POWER RATIO | [2022/42] | French: | SCHÉMA DE MODULATION BASÉ SUR UNE INSERTION NON NULLE ET PERMETTANT UN FAIBLE RAPPORT DE PUISSANCE DE CRÊTE SUR PUISSANCE MOYENNE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 14.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8934571 (STEWART BRIAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* column 10, line 38 - column 11, line 42 *; | [XI]US2018331775 (LIN XINGQIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0048]; figure 1 * [I] 5-14 |