EP4064783 - METHOD FOR RANDOM ACCESS, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Cong No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 19953227.6 | 20.11.2019 | [2022/39] | WO2019CN119778 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021097723 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064783 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4064783 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/0833, // H04W74/00, H04W76/27, H04W76/30 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP);
H04W74/0841 (US);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W74/006 (EP,US);
H04W74/0866 (US);
H04W76/30 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/25] | H04W74/0833, // H04W74/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/39] | H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIREKTZUGRIFF, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD FOR RANDOM ACCESS, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2022 | Translation filed | 13.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019132857 (BABAEI ALIREZA [US], et al) [X] 1,10,14,15* paragraph [0291] *; | [XAI] - CMCC, "BWP and sub-band switching for NR-U in RACH", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191004), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1912936 BWP AND SUB-BAND SWITCHING FOR NR-U IN RACH (REVISION OF R2-1909436), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOP, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107bis/Docs/R2-1912936.zip R2-1912936 BWP and sub-band switching for NR-U in RACH (Revision of R2-1909436).doc, (20191004), XP051804736 [X] 1,2,8,10,11,14,15 * section Random Access; page 2 * [A] 4,12 [I] 3,5-7,9,13 | [X] - MOTOROLA MOBILITY ET AL, "Remaining details for BWP operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1807277 REMAINING DETAILS FOR BWP OPERATION FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANC, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20180520), XP051442473 [X] 1,10,14,15 * section 3 * |