EP4064533 - ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Yu c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 19953252.4 | 18.11.2019 | [2022/39] | WO2019JP45037 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021100075 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064533 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/215, H02K11/25, H02K11/33, H02K11/27, H02K11/40, H05K1/02 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H02K11/215 (EP);
H02K11/40 (EP,US);
H02K11/0094 (US);
H02K11/21 (US);
H02K11/25 (EP,US);
H02K11/27 (EP);
H02K11/33 (EP);
H05K1/0203 (EP);
H05K1/181 (EP);
B62D5/0403 (US);
H02K2211/03 (EP,US);
H05K1/144 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | H02K29/08, H02K11/21, H02K11/25, H02K11/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE DREHMASCHINE UND ELEKTRISCHE SERVOLENKUNG | [2022/39] | English: | ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE TOURNANTE ET DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION ASSISTÉE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2022 | Translation filed | 20.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018062556 (YUE XIAOFEI [JP]) [Y] 6,12 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0065]; figures 3-5 *; | [I]EP3447887 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [I] 1-3,13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-4 *; | [IY]WO2019073594 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-3,5,7,13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0073]; figures 5, 6 * [Y] 4,6,12; | [Y]US2019260324 (KURAMITSU SHUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0109]; figures 8, 9 * | International search | [Y]JPH10135588 (UNISIA JECS CORP, et al) [Y] 6-13 * , paragraphs [0004]-[0013], fig. 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2012210031 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0069]-[0089], fig. 2 *; | [Y]JP2015079649 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 7-13 * , paragraphs [0039]-[0054], fig. 2 *; | [Y]JP2017159771 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0040], fig. 3 *; | [A]JP2018051821 (SEIKO EPSON CORP)[A] 1-13; | [Y]JP2018130007 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0039], [0040], [0134]-[0141], fig. 22 * | by applicant | JP2016171664 | JP2017159768 | JP2017189034 |