EP4000911 - MOLDING METHOD AND MOLDING DIE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAZAWA, Toshiki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Masahiko c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 03 /
MANO, Shoya c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 19953854.7 | 26.11.2019 | [2022/21] | WO2019JP46163 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021106074 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000911 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29K105/10, B29C33/42, B29C53/04, B29C65/70, B29C70/28, B29C70/08, B29C70/20, B29C70/38 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B29C53/04 (EP,US);
B29C33/42 (EP,US);
B29C70/30 (EP);
B29C70/38 (EP);
B29C70/386 (US);
B29D99/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | B29K105/10, B29C33/42, B29C53/04, B29C65/70, B29C70/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | FORMVERFAHREN UND FORMWERKZEUG | [2022/21] | English: | MOLDING METHOD AND MOLDING DIE | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE ET MATRICE DE MOULAGE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2022 | Translation filed | 14.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0671742 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,4-7 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]JPH0747596 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 3* paragraph [0010]; figure 3 *; | [XI]US9782958 (CANO CEDIEL DAVID [ES], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * figures 2-4 * [I] 2-4,6; | [XI]US2017291376 (WADSWORTH MARK ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figures 5-12 * [I] 2,3; | [A]US2019275749 (SEKINE NAOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0056] * | International search | [XY]JPH0671742 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-2,4-7 * [0024]-[0032], [2], [10], [12] * [Y] 3; | [A]WO2013129075 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP])[A] 1-7; | [XY]US2015053332 (CANO CEDIEL DAVID [ES], et al) [X] 1-2,4-7 * [0067]-[0083], Figs.2-6 * [Y] 3; | [Y]JP2019151083 (SUBARU CORP) [Y] 3 * [0 0 1 3] - [004 6] * | by applicant | US8142181 |