EP4044371 - REFLECTOR ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Hiromasa c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Shinichi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
TAKIKAWA, Michio c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
NUIMURA, Shuji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 19954024.6 | 27.11.2019 | [2022/33] | WO2019JP46266 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021106093 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044371 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4044371 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/19, H01Q15/00, H01Q19/13, H01Q19/02, H01Q5/30, H01Q15/16 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H01Q5/30 (EP,US);
H01Q19/13 (US);
H01Q15/0013 (EP);
H01Q15/16 (EP,US);
H01Q19/026 (EP);
H01Q19/132 (EP);
H01Q19/19 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H01Q19/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLEKTORANTENNENVORRICHTUNG | [2022/33] | English: | REFLECTOR ANTENNA DEVICE | [2022/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE À RÉFLECTEUR | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | Translation filed | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 10.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | LU | 27.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5944108 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-4,6-8 * figures 1A, 1B, 2A, 2B * * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] - [0 36] *; | [A]US6285332 (CHANDLER CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-4,6-8 * figures 2, 5a, 5b *; | [A]US7053861 (RAWNICK JAMES [US], et al) [A] 5 * figures 3, 3A ** column 8, line 4 - line 10 *; | [A]US2019296445 (TAKIKAWA MICHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1, 2, 3, 4 * * column 3, line 18 - line 24 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 19 * | International search | [XY]JPS5944108 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-4,6-8 * 3, 4, 1, 2 3, 4, 1, 2 * [Y] 5; | [Y]JPH05251925 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 5 * 0009,-0016,5,6 *; | [A]US2005195120 (RAWNICK JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-8; | [A]US7737903 (RAO SUDHAKAR K [US], et al) [A] 1-8; | [A]WO2018109837 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP])[A] 1-8 | by applicant | JPS5592002 |