EP4065641 - FLAME RETARDANT POLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 18.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Silicones Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yan 936 Zhangheng Road, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
BHAGWAGAR, Dorab 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | 03 /
CAO, Zhongwei 936 Zhangheng Road, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19954594.8 | 25.11.2019 | [2022/40] | WO2019CN120546 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021102621 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065641 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08L83/07, C08K3/22, // C08L83/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K3/00, C08G77/12, C08G77/14, C08G77/16, C08G77/20, C08G77/18 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,KR);
C08G77/16 (EP,KR);
C08G77/18 (EP,KR);
C08G77/20 (EP,KR);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K5/5419 (KR);
C08K5/544 (KR);
C08K9/06 (KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR);
C08K2003/2227 (EP);
C08K2003/2241 (EP);
C08K2003/2296 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/001 (EP);
C08K2201/005 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/011 (EP);
C08K3/016 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08K5/544, C08K5/5419, C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08K5/56, C08K3/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | C08L83/04, C08L83/07, C08K3/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE POLYSILOXANZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/40] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT POLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION | [2022/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYSILOXANE IGNIFUGE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 18.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5981641 (TAKAHASHI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * examples 1-5; table 2 *; | [XA]US2018022977 (TSUJI KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * example -; claim - * [A] 6; | [X]US2018104384 (NAKAI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9* example 10 *; | [X]WO2019093052 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * examples 1-4,7-10; claim - * |