Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021120050 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN126266 | 18.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022322319 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN126266 | 18.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114747237B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2023 | B | CN114747237 | 12.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN126266 | 18.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4061023 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2022 | A4 | EP4061023 | 21.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN126266 | 18.12.2019 |