EP4061023 - METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING CONFIGURATION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, Shuri Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DING, Mengying Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Peng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 19956884.1 | 18.12.2019 | [2022/38] | WO2019CN126266 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021120050 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061023 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/08, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H04W4/08 (EP);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0033 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM SENDEN VON KONFIGURATIONSINFORMATIONEN | [2022/38] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING CONFIGURATION INFORMATION | [2022/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DESTINÉS À L'ENVOI D'INFORMATIONS DE CONFIGURATION | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2022 | Translation filed | 15.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 03.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019342910 (CAO YU [CA], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0235] * |