EP4081872 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN AGNOSTIC SYSTEM FUNCTIONAL STATUS DETERMINATION AND AUTOMATIC MANAGEMENT OF FAILURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Embraer S.A. Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2.170 12227-901 São José dos Campos SP / BR | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURETTA, Felipe Magno da Silva Rua João Afonso Moreira, 510 - apt. 102 Bairro Ouro Preto 31310-130 Belo Horizonte (MG) / BR | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 19957418.7 | 23.12.2019 | [2022/44] | WO2019IB61307 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021130520 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081872 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G05B19/414, G06N5/04, G06N5/00, G05B17/02, G06N3/08, G06N5/02 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
G05B23/0243 (EP,US);
G07C5/0825 (US);
B64D45/00 (US);
B64F5/60 (US);
G05B17/02 (EP);
G05B23/0272 (EP,US);
G05B23/0275 (EP,US);
G06N5/02 (EP);
G07C5/0808 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | G05B23/02, G05B19/414, G06N5/04, G06N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES FUNKTIONSZUSTANDS EINES AGNOSTISCHEN SYSTEMS UND AUTOMATISCHEN VERWALTUNG VON AUSFÄLLEN | [2022/44] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN AGNOSTIC SYSTEM FUNCTIONAL STATUS DETERMINATION AND AUTOMATIC MANAGEMENT OF FAILURES | [2022/44] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTERMINATION D'ÉTAT FONCTIONNEL D'UN SYSTÈME AGNOSTIQUE ET DE GESTION AUTOMATIQUE DE DÉFAILLANCES | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 14.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011288836 (LACAILLE JEROME [FR], et al); | [X]US9481473 (SKERTIC RICHARD J [US]); | [X]US2017352204 (HUET JEAN-MAX [FR], et al); | [X]EP3486739 (BOEING CO [US]) | International search | [Y]US6907416 (TASOOJI AMANEH [US], et al); | [Y]US7305272 (MATURANA FRANCISCO P [US], et al); | [X]US8260736 (LEAR MICHAEL T [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011288836 | US9481473 | US2017352204 | EP3486739 |