30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
15.08.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
22.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
08.09.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
07.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.09.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.05.2023 |
Change - inventor |
|
12.05.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
28.04.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
21.04.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
03.03.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.03.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
24.02.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2022 |
First examination report |
|
27.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.10.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
14.10.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
10.10.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.09.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] |
02.09.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] |
20.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
24.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|