EP4066756 - SURGICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVERFIELD Inc. 8-1-22 Akasaka Minato-ku 1070052 Tokyo / JP | [2023/24] |
Former [2023/22] | For all designated states RIVERFIELD Inc. 20 Samon-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1600017 / JP | ||
Former [2022/40] | For all designated states Riverfield Inc. 20 Samon-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADANO, Kotaro c/o RIVERFIELD Inc., 20 Samon-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | 02 /
SHINDO, Koki c/o RIVERFIELD Inc., 20 Samon-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/40] | 01 /
TADANO Kotaro c/o RIVERFIELD Inc., 20 Samon-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | ||
02 /
SHINDO Koki c/o RIVERFIELD Inc., 20 Samon-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | Representative(s) | adares Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Reininger & Partner GmbB Tauentzienstraße 7 b/c 10789 Berlin / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 19957760.2 | 25.12.2019 | [2022/40] | WO2019JP51045 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021130945 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066756 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4066756 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B34/00 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A61B34/71 (EP);
A61B17/2804 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | A61B17/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | SURGICAL DEVICE | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | Translation filed | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 14.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | LU | 25.12.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
IT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017252096 (FELDER KEVIN D [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0072] , [0143]; figures 17,19-25 *; | [X]AU2018290914 (COLUBRISMX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5* paragraphs [0128] - [0130] - [0132]; figures 17,20-22 * | International search | [XA]JP2009107087 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0192], fig. 1-43, paragraphs [0001]-[0192], fig. 1-43 * [A] 3; | [XA]JP2011072574 (TERUMO CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0179], fig. 1-32, paragraphs [0001]-[0179], fig. 1-32 * [A] 3; | [A]WO2015012023 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0135], fig. 1-24 *; | [A]JP2016518160 (SRI INTERNATIONAL) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0164], fig. 1-18E *; | [A]WO2018179140 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5* , paragraphs [0001]-[0014], fig. 1-14 *; | [XA]US2019328467 (WATERBURY ANDREW C [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0092], fig. 1-19, paragraphs [0001]-[0092], fig. 1-19 * [A] 3 | by applicant | JPS4938753B |