EP4087253 - TRANSFORMATION METHOD, ENCODER, DECODER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUO, Junyan No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xinwei No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
QIAO, Wenhan No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 04 /
MA, Yanzhuo No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 05 /
WAN, Shuai No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 06 /
YANG, Fuzheng No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 19958505.0 | 30.12.2019 | [2022/45] | WO2019CN130157 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021134327 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087253 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/50, H04N19/12, H04N19/159, H04N19/61, H04N19/593, H04N19/70 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/12 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | H04N19/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | TRANSFORMATIONSVERFAHREN, CODIERER, DECODIERER UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/45] | English: | TRANSFORMATION METHOD, ENCODER, DECODER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFORMATION, CODEUR, DÉCODEUR, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2022 | Translation filed | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY] - KARAM NASER (INTERDIGITAL) ET AL, "CE6 Related: MIP Adaptation On Top of CE6-1.1d", no. JVET-P0349, (20190924), 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P0349-v1.zip JVET-P0349.docx, (20190924), XP030217022 [I] 1,3,6,7,13-15 * Introduction and 8.7.4.3; page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 * [A] 2,4,5 [Y] 8-12 | [IAY] - SHRESTHA (CHOSUN) S ET AL, "Non-CE6: Simplification of LFNST LUT", no. JVET-P0313 ; m50278, (20191004), 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P0313-v2.zip JVET-P0313-v2.docx, (20191004), XP030216902 [I] 1,3,6,7,13-15 * Abstract, Introduction, Proposed method; page 1 - page 2 * [A] 2,4,5 [Y] 8-12 |