EP3805457 - MACHINE ASSEMBLY FOR REPAIRING RAILWAY LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CFT GmbH Compact Filter Technic Beisenstraße 39-41 45964 Gladbeck / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funke, Thomas Kiefernweg 28 14554 Neu-Seddin / DE | 02 /
Brill, Mike Riemker Straße 83 44625 Herne / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstraße 2 45219 Essen / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 20000368.9 | 09.10.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | DE201910127286 | 10.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019127286 | DE202010104482 | 20.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020104482 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805457 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E01B27/06 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
E01B27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINENVERBUND ZUR SANIERUNG VON BAHNSTRECKEN | [2021/15] | English: | MACHINE ASSEMBLY FOR REPAIRING RAILWAY LINES | [2021/15] | French: | RÉSEAU DES MACHINES DESTINÉ À LA RÉNOVATION DES VOIES DE CHEMIN DE FER | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2655669 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]) [Y] 14,15* page 12, paragraph l - page 13, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [XI]WO9115630 (LORAM MAINTENANCE OF WAY [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 6 - page 7; figure - * [I] 4-6,11,16,19-23; | [XYI]EP0663472 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]) [X] 1-3,12,13,17 * columns 2-4; figure - * [Y] 7,8,14,15,18 [I] 4-6,11,16,19-23; | [Y]DE19511085 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]) [Y] 7,8,18 * paragraphs [0022] - [0026]; figure - *; | [XAI]EP1249537 (GSG KNAPE GLEISSANIERUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0011] - [0032]; figure - * [A] 9,10 [I] 4-6,11,16,19-23 | by applicant | EP2159323 |