EP3991549 - MARKING OF ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR HORSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rüenberg UG Hagelsweg 3 48599 Gronau / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niehues, Timo 48599 Gronau / DE | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Busse, Harald F.W. Hansaallee 36 48429 Rheine / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20000385.3 | 27.10.2020 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991549 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00, B68C1/12, G09F3/04, G09F7/04 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A01K11/00 (EP);
B68C1/12 (EP);
G09F21/02 (EP);
G09F21/023 (EP);
G09F7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KENNZEICHNUNG VON TIEREN, INSBESONDERE PFERDEN | [2022/18] | English: | MARKING OF ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR HORSES | [2022/18] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'ANIMAUX, EN PARTICULIER DE CHEVAUX | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/15] | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2273386 (SUTTON ANN CHARLOTTE [GB]) [Y] 14,15* page 4 - page 5; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]DE202019003281U (RUEENBERG UG HAFTUNGSBESCHRAENKT & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [Y] 14,15; | [A]DE202019004713U (HKM SPORTS EQUIPMENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |