EP3705458 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF LIQUIDS CONTAINING AMMONIA AND INSTALLATION FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steffen Hartmann Recyclingtechnologien GmbH Am Schmiedegassenweg 4 06502 Thale/OT Allrode / DE | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNTZE, Christoph Hagenberg 35b 38899 Stiege / DE | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Schuster, Müller & Partner mbB Olvenstedter Strasse 15 39108 Magdeburg / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 20020098.8 | 04.03.2020 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | DE201910105353 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019105353 | [2020/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705458 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705458 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/12, B01D3/06, C02F1/44, // C02F101/16 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C02F1/441 (EP);
B01D3/065 (EP);
C02F1/12 (EP);
C02F2101/16 (EP);
C02F2301/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFBEREITUNG AMMONIAKHALTIGER FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND ANLAGE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2020/37] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF LIQUIDS CONTAINING AMMONIA AND INSTALLATION FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE LIQUIDES CONTENANT L'AMMONIAQUE ET INSTALLATION DE MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCÉDÉ | [2023/31] |
Former [2020/37] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE LIQUIDES CONTENANT L'AMMONIAQUE ET INSTALLATION DE MISE EN UVRE DU PROCÉDÉ | Examination procedure | 08.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 08.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1020407 (UWATECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] *; | [AD]EP2404887 (HARTMANN STEFFEN [DE]) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2808304 (MKR METZGER GMBH RECYCLINGSYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * | by applicant | WO2009012967 | EP2404887 |