EP3964523 - PREPARATION OF FETUIN A BY HYDROPHOBIC INTERACTION CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PreviPharma Consulting GmbH CUBEX 41, Universitätsmedizin Mannheim, Haus 41 Theodor-Kutzer-Ufer 1-3 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kießig, Stephan T. D-69168 Wiesloch / DE | 02 /
Berger, Tina D-64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Mandago, Maurice D-69250 Schönau / DE | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Sacht-Gorny, Gudrun Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Sacht-Gorny Sonnenuhrweg 17 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20020398.2 | 04.09.2020 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964523 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/81, C07K1/20, A61K38/17, A61K38/57 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/8139 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FETUIN A DURCH HYDROPHOBE INTERAKTIONSCHROMATOGRAFIE | [2022/10] | English: | PREPARATION OF FETUIN A BY HYDROPHOBIC INTERACTION CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2022/10] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE FETUINE A PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'INTERACTION HYDROPHOBE | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/08] | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011063943 (GLYCOTOPE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XDI] - SIMONE CARTELLIERI ET AL, "One-step affinity purification of fetuin from fetal bovine serum", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY, US, (20020401), vol. 35, no. 2, doi:10.1042/BA20010067, ISSN 0885-4513, pages 83 - 89, XP055769248 [XD] 14 * the whole document * [I] 1-13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BA20010067 | [A] - O R Ds ET AL, "Method Development for Hydrophobic Interaction Chromatography (HIC) Based Protein Separations on Waters Protein-Pak Hi Res HIC Columns", (20151201), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://www.waters.com/webassets/cms/library/docs/720005514en.pdf, (20210127), XP055769581 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KATSUHITO MORI ET AL, "Fetuin-A: A Multifunctional Protein", RECENT PATENTS ON ENDOCRINE, METABOLIC AND IMMUNE DRUG DISCOVERY, (20110501), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.2174/187221411799015372, ISSN 1872-2148, pages 124 - 146, XP055769226 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/187221411799015372 | by applicant | US1580090 | US7324742 | - SCHLIEPER G.WESTENFELD R.BRANDENBURG V.KETTELER M., "Inhibitors of calcification in blood and urine", Semin Dial, (20070000), vol. 20, pages 113 - 121 | - HEISS A.DUCHESNE A.DENECKE B.GROTZINGER J.YAMAMOTO K.RENNE T.JAHNEN-DECHENT W., "Structural basis of calcification inhibition by alpha 2-HS glycoprotein/fetuin-A. Formation of colloidal calciprotein particles", J Biol Chem, (20030000), vol. 278, doi:10.1074/jbc.M210868200, pages 13333 - 13341, XP055021395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210868200 | - QUELCH K.J.COLE W.G.MELICK R.A., "Non-collagenous proteins in normal and pathological human bone", Calcif Tissue Int, (19840000), vol. 36, pages 545 - 549 | - KETTELER M.BONGARTZ P.WESTENFELD R.WILDBERGER J.MAHNKEN A.BOHM R.METZGER T.WANNER C.JAHNEN-DECHENT W.FLOEGE J., "Association of low fetuin-A (AHSG) concentrations in serum with cardiovascular mortality in patients on dialysis: a cross-sectional study", Lancet, (20030000), vol. 361, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(03)12710-9, pages 827 - 833, XP004783594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(03)12710-9 | - REYNOLDS J.L.SKEPPER J.N.MCNAIR R.KASAMA T.GUPTA K.WEISSBERG P.L.JAHNEN-DECHENT W.SHANAHAN C.M., "Multifunctional roles for serum protein fetuin-a in inhibition of human vascular smooth muscle cell calcification", J Am Soc Nephrol, (20050000), vol. 16, doi:10.1681/ASN.2004100895, pages 2920 - 2930, XP002661244 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2004100895 | - SWEET MGSWEET JMJEREMIAH MPGALAZKA SS, "Diagnosis and treatment of osteoporosis", Am Fam Physician, (20090000), vol. 79, pages 193 - 200 | - JAGLAL SBSHERRY PGSCHATZKER J., "The impact of hip fracture in Ontario and its consequences", Can J Surg, (19960000), vol. 2, pages 105 - 111 | - TOROIANTOROIAN D.LIM J.E.PRICE P.A. et al., "The size exclusion characteristics of type I collagen: implications for the role of non-collagenous bone constituents in mineralization", J Biol Chem, (20070000), vol. 282, no. 31, pages 22437 - 22447 | - IX J.H.WASSEL C.L.BAUER D.C.TOROIAN D.TYLAVSKY F.A.CAULEY J.A.HARRIS T.B.PRICE P.A.CUMMINGS S.R.SHLIPAK M.G., "Fetuin-A and bone mineral density in older persons: The Health Aging and Body Composition (Health ABC) study", J Bone Miner Res, (20090000), vol. 24, pages 514 - 521 | - CHAILURKIT L.KRUAVIT A.RAJATANAVIN R.ONGPHIPHADHANAKUL B., "The relationship of fetuin-A and lactoferrin with bone mass in elderly women", Osteoporos Int, (20110000), vol. 22, doi:10.1007/s00198-010-1439-3, pages 2159 - 2164, XP019911457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00198-010-1439-3 | - SPIRO R. G., Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19600000), vol. 235, no. 10, page 2860 | - CARTELLIERI S. et al., Biotechnol. Appl. Biochem., (20020000), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 83 - 9 |