EP3678154 - A LOCKING SYSTEM FOR USE WITH A TRIGGER ASSEMBLY OF AN ELECTRICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Defond Components Limited 5/F, Chai Wan Industrial Centre 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan / HK | For all designated states Defond Electech Co., Ltd Hongmei Second Industrial Area Hongmei Town Dongguan Guangdong 523160 / CN | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Kin Yu 5/F, Chai Wan Industrial Centre, 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan / HK | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 20150034.5 | 02.01.2020 | [2020/28] | Priority number, date | HK20190100096 | 03.01.2019 Original published format: HK 19100096 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678154 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/20, H01H9/06, H01H21/10, B25F5/02 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
H01H3/20 (EP,US);
H01H3/02 (CN);
B25F5/02 (EP,US);
H01H19/36 (US);
H01H21/10 (EP);
H01H9/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINER AUSLÖSERANORDNUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/28] | English: | A LOCKING SYSTEM FOR USE WITH A TRIGGER ASSEMBLY OF AN ELECTRICAL DEVICE | [2020/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC UN ENSEMBLE DE DÉCLENCHEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/28] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 30.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1759813 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022]; figures 8,9 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 3,5; | [YA]EP2101340 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * figure 4 *[A] 1; | [YA]EP3415280 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072]; figures 5-9 * [A] 1-9 |