EP3654632 - IMAGING DEVICE, IMAGING SYSTEM, AND IMAGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oba, Eiji c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20150096.4 | 27.07.2011 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | JP20100191376 | 27.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010191376 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654632 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/00, H04N23/63 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04N23/635 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04845 (CN,US);
G06T5/70 (US);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/80 (US);
G06T2207/10004 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H04N5/232, H04N5/225 | ||
Former IPC [2020/21] | H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM UND BILDGEBUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/21] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE, IMAGING SYSTEM, AND IMAGING METHOD | [2020/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE, SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 19.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11175649.0 / EP2424221 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5815199 (PALM STEPHEN RAY [JP], et al); | [A]US6693524 (PAYNE GEORGE R [US]); | [Y]US2006017807 (LEE LOUIE [CA], et al); | [A]JP2007166351 (SONY CORP); | [A]EP2104343 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [AD]JP2010033108 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2002019556 | JP2010033108 | JP2010191376 |