EP3689224 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING INTRAUTERINE PRESSURE USING A PRESSURE CUFF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHISLER, Jordan 35 Vernon St. 307 Brookline, MA Massachusetts 01801 / US | 02 /
BEGG, Nikolai D. 100 Elmwood Rd. Wellesley, MA Massachusetts 02481 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20150364.6 | 06.01.2020 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | US201916241075 | 07.01.2019 Original published format: US201916241075 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689224 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/303, A61B5/03 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
A61M3/0208 (EP,US);
A61B1/303 (EP);
A61B17/135 (US);
A61B17/42 (US);
A61B5/033 (EP);
A61M3/0202 (EP,US);
A61M3/0216 (EP,US);
A61M3/022 (EP,US);
A61M3/0233 (EP,US);
A61M3/0262 (EP,US);
A61B2017/4216 (US);
A61B5/022 (US);
A61M2205/075 (EP);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND STEUERUNG DES INTRAUTERINEN DRUCKS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER DRUCKMANSCHETTE | [2020/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING INTRAUTERINE PRESSURE USING A PRESSURE CUFF | [2020/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE CONTRÔLE DE LA PRESSION INTRA-UTÉRINE À L'AIDE D'UNE MANCHETTE DE PRESSION | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 25.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3996921 (NEUWIRTH ROBERT S); | [X]US2016220102 (SHENER-IRMAKOGLU CEMAL [US], et al) | by applicant | US8062214 | US2017000946 |