EP3713217 - SYSTEM AND CAMERA DEVICE FOR CAPTURING IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Nigel John c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | 02 /
CAPPELLO, Fabio c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | 03 /
GUPTA, Rajeev c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | 04 /
BREUGELMANS, Mark Jacobus c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20150461.0 | 07.01.2020 | [2020/39] | Priority number, date | GB20190003715 | 19.03.2019 Original published format: GB 201903715 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3713217 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3713217 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713217 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/695 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP);
H04N23/61 (CN,GB,US);
G06T7/0002 (GB);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/006 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/088 (EP);
G06T7/73 (EP);
G06T7/74 (US);
G06T7/80 (US);
H04N23/611 (EP);
H04N23/64 (EP,CN,GB);
H04N23/695 (CN);
B64U2101/30 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06T2200/21 (EP);
G06T2207/10004 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,GB,US);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30168 (EP);
G06T2207/30196 (EP);
G06T2207/30232 (EP);
G06T2207/30244 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (GB)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04N5/232, G06T7/70, G06N3/02, B64C39/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND KAMERAVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON BILDERN | [2020/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND CAMERA DEVICE FOR CAPTURING IMAGES | [2020/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF DE CAMÉRA POUR LA CAPTURE D'IMAGES | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 29.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | MC | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | LU | 07.01.2024 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/43] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
IT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
PL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SK | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
LU | 07.01.2024 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
PT | 08.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
IT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
PL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SK | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
PT | 08.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017220036 (VISSER ERIK [US], et al); | [XAYI]CN107749952 (HANGZHOU LINGFAN TECH CO LTD); | [Y]US2018262683 (MELER ANTOINE [FR], et al); | [Y]CN109144092 (YUNEEC ELECTRIC ENERGY SPORTS TECH KUNSHAN CO LTD); |