EP3734449 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTEGRATION OF AN APPLICATION RUNTIME ENVIRONMENT INTO A USER COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sweetlabs, Inc. 501 W. Broadway, Suite 800 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | [2023/28] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Sweetlabs, Inc. 656 Fifth Avenue, Suite A San Diego, CA 92101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEREDITH, Matt 161 1st Street Urbandale, IA 50323 / US | 02 /
ROBINSON, Aaron 4902 Westcliffe Court Sylvania, OH 43560 / US | 03 /
MACHADO, Blake 2146 Dunhaven Street San Diego, CA 92110 / US | 04 /
CHAVARRIA, Damien Domaine de Clovallon Ancienne route de Beziers 34600 Bedarieux / FR | 05 /
BOURKE, Adrian 888 W.E Street Unit 3505 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | [2023/28] |
Former [2020/45] | 01 /
MEREDITH, Matt 1457 Centinela Avenue 5 San Monica, CA 90404 / US | ||
02 /
ROBINSON, Aaron 575 Sixth Avenue 1405 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | |||
03 /
MACHADO, Blake 327 D Avenue Coronado, CA 92118 / US | |||
04 /
CHAVARRIA, Damien 15 chemin des Aires 34600 Bedarieux / FR | |||
05 /
BOURKE, Adrian 969 Market Street 1204 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 20150741.5 | 20.06.2011 | [2020/45] | Priority number, date | US201035651310P | 18.06.2010 Original published format: US 35651310 P | US201037701010P | 25.08.2010 Original published format: US 37701010 P | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734449 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3734449 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455, G06F9/44, G06F8/60 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G06F8/60 (EP,US);
G06F8/61 (US);
G06F3/048 (US);
G06F9/45504 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2020/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION EINER ANWENDUNGSLAUFZEITUMGEBUNG IN EINE RECHNERUMGEBUNG EINES BENUTZERS | [2020/45] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTEGRATION OF AN APPLICATION RUNTIME ENVIRONMENT INTO A USER COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT | [2020/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'INTÉGRER UN ENVIRONNEMENT D'EXÉCUTION D'APPLICATION DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE D'UTILISATEUR | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/45] | 27.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 27.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11730803.1 / EP2583174 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Request for further processing for: | 25.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006120280 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [XI]US7681134 (GRECHISHKIN ALEXANDER V [RU], et al) | by applicant | US20090398136 |