EP3686463 - VEHICLE DRIVE-FORCE TRANSMITTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORI, Tetsuo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2021/36] |
Former [2020/31] | 01 /
HORI, Tetsuo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20150772.0 | 08.01.2020 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | JP20190011717 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019011717 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686463 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686463 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
F16H57/0434 (EP);
F16H57/0436 (CN);
F16H57/0439 (US);
F16H48/06 (US);
F16H57/021 (US);
F16H57/037 (US);
F16H57/0421 (EP);
F16H57/0423 (US);
F16H57/0424 (CN,US);
F16H57/0441 (EP,US);
F16H57/0442 (CN);
F16H57/0445 (CN);
F16H57/045 (EP,CN);
F16H57/0452 (US);
F16H57/0471 (CN);
F16H57/0482 (US);
B60K6/365 (US);
B60K6/445 (US);
B60Y2200/92 (US);
F16H2057/02034 (US);
F16H2057/02043 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGANTRIEBSKRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/31] | English: | VEHICLE DRIVE-FORCE TRANSMITTING APPARATUS | [2020/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE FORCE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE VÉHICULE | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2020 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | IT | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | TR | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IE | 08.01.2022 | IS | 08.01.2022 | LU | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 08.01.2020 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IE | 08.01.2022 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IE | 08.01.2022 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IE | 08.01.2022 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IE | 08.01.2022 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IE | 08.01.2022 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2009222159 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,4 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] * [A] 2,3,5; | [A]US2013283972 (YAMAMOTO YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0078] ** figures 1-6 *; | [YA]US8899381 (EBIHARA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4 * figures 1-3 * * column 8, lines 6-11 * * column 13, line 39 - column 14, line 32 * [A] 2,3,5 | by applicant | JP2017136964 | JP2018025282 |