EP3848308 - SYSTEM FOR SORTING ITEMS IN MATRIX ARRANGEMENT LOGICALLY LINKED TO THEIR TARGET DESTINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körber Supply Chain Logistics GmbH Lilienthalstraße 16/18 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITZSCHE, Roland Flachsröststr. 50f 90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20150952.8 | 09.01.2020 | [2021/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848308 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/46, B07C3/00, B07C3/08, B65G47/53, // B65G37/02 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
B65G47/53 (EP,US);
B07C3/08 (EP,US);
B65G37/02 (EP,US);
B65G47/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM SORTIEREN VON SORTIERSTÜCKEN IN MIT IHRER ZIELDESTINATION LOGISCH VERKNÜPFTE ZIELSTELLEN IN MATRIXANORDNUNG | [2021/28] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SORTING ITEMS IN MATRIX ARRANGEMENT LOGICALLY LINKED TO THEIR TARGET DESTINATION | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRI DES PIÈCES À TRIER DANS LES STATIONS DE DESTINATION LIÉES LOGIQUEMENT À LEUR DESTINATION CIBLE DANS UN AGENCEMENT MATRICE | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 06.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004073333 (BRILL ERIC A [US]) [A] 1* figures 1-7 *; | [XI]US2007075000 (MARTENS SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0045] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,3,6; | [X]US2018154398 (LAYNE JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0098] * * figures 26-28 * |