EP3662928 - ANTIBODIES BINDING TO TUMOUR ASSOCIATED CARBOHYDRATE ANTIGENS, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBI Pharma Inc. Room W1907, 19F 3 Yuan Qu Street Taipei 115 / TW | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAI, Jiann-Shiun Room W1907, 19F 3 Yuan Qu Street 115 Taipei / TW | 02 /
CHEN, I-Ju Room W1907, 19F 3 Yuan Qu Street 115 Taipei / TW | 03 /
WANG, Cheng-Chi Room W1907, 19F, 3 Yuan Qu Street 115 Taipei / TW | 04 /
TSAI, Yi-Chien Room W1907, 19F, 3 Yuan Qu Street 115 Taipei / TW | 05 /
YU, Cheng Der Tony Room W1907, 19F, 3 Yuan Qu Street 115 Taipei / TW | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 20151337.1 | 10.04.2015 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | US201461977824P | 10.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461977824 P | US201462057381P | 30.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462057381 P | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662928 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K31/7105, C07K16/30, C07K16/44, A61P35/00 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/30 (IL,US);
C07K16/3015 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/39558 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/303 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/44 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/163 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/14 (IL,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/72 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER MIT BINDUNG AN TUMORASSOZIIERTE KOHLENHYDRATANTIGENE, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/25] | English: | ANTIBODIES BINDING TO TUMOUR ASSOCIATED CARBOHYDRATE ANTIGENS, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2020/24] | French: | ANTICORPS SE LIANT À DES ANTIGÈNES CARBOHYDRATE ASSOCIÉS À DES TUMEURS, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/24] | ANTIKÖRPER, DIE AN TUMOR ASSOZIIERTE KOHLEHYDRAT-ANTIGENE BINDEN, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DEREN ANWENDUNG | ||
Former [2020/24] | ANTICORPS SE LIANT AUX ANTIGÈNES GLUCIDIQUES ASSOCIÉS À LA TUMEUR, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACETIQUES AND LEUR UTILISATION | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15777370.6 / EP3129048 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004005349 (IGENEON KREBS IMMUNTHERAPIE [AT], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [T]WO2015143123 (MACKAY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF TAIWAN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH AND MACKAY MEMORIAL SOCIAL WORK FOUNDATION, et al) [T] * example - *; | [I] - Cascinelli N ET AL, "Evaluation of toxic effects following administration of monoclonal antibody MBr1 in patients with breast cancer. - PubMed - NCBI", Tumori, (19860630), pages 267 - 71, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/2874647, (20170915), XP055407025 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - JUNG-TUNG HUNG ET AL, "Abstract 2529: A monoclonal anti-Globo H antibody, VK9 can mediate CDC/ADCC and inhibit adhesion of Globo H + cancer cells to extracellular matrix", CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20120415), vol. 72, no. 8 Supplement, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM2012-2529, ISSN 0008-5472, XP055358707 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2012-2529 | by applicant | EP0125023 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0184187 | WO8702671 | US4816567 | WO9003184 | EP0519596 | US5225539 | WO9611711 | US5585089 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5770429 | WO9836772 | WO0041720 | WO0048630 | US2004087651 | US2004126829 | WO2006134423 | WO2007026190 | US7625559 | US8236311 | US8268969 | - WW CHANG et al., "Expression of Globo H and SSEA3 in breast cancer stem cells and the involvement of fucosyl transferases 1 and 2 in Globo H synthesis", PNAS, vol. 105, no. 33, doi:10.1073/pnas.0804979105, pages 11667 - 11672, XP009124986 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0804979105 | - TUTT et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69 | - CHOTHIA, C. et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - MORRISON, S. L., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207 | - OI et al., BioTechniques, (19860000), vol. 4, page 214 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 552 - 525 | - VERHOEYAN et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 1041 - 1043 | - BEIDLER et al., J. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060 | - MORRISON et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - SUN et al., PNAS, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 3439 - 3443 | - LIU et al., J. Immunol., (19870000), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526 | - NISHIMURA et al., Canc. Res., (19870000), vol. 47, pages 999 - 1005 | - WOOD et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449 | - SHAW et al., J. Natl. Cancer Inst., (19880000), vol. 80, pages 1553 - 1559 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - KUFER et al., Trends Biotechnol, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 238 - 244 | - BOWIE et al., Science, (19900000), vol. 247, pages 1306 - 1310 | - CUNNINGHAM et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - PEARSON, Methods Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 243, pages 307 - 31 | - QUEEN et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033 | - GONNET et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 256, pages 1443 - 45 | - "Methods in Molecular Biology", Peptide Synthesis Protocols, Pierce Chemical Co., (19840000), vol. 35 | - G. BARANYR. B. MERRIFIELD, The Peptides: Analysis, Synthesis, Biology, Academic Press, (19800000), vol. 1, 2, pages 3 - 254 | - GLOBO H. KOHLERMILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - LONBERG et al., Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, no. 6474, pages 856 - 859 | - LONBERG, N., Handbook of Experimental Pharmacology, (19940000), vol. 113, pages 49 - 101 | - LONBERG, N.HUSZAR, D., Intern. Rev. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - HARDING, F.LONBERG, N., Ann. N.Y Acad. Sci., (19950000), vol. 764, pages 536 - 546 | - BALASSIANO et al., Intern. J. Mol. Med., (20020000), vol. 10, pages 785 - 788 | - THORNE et al., Neuroscience, (20040000), vol. 127, pages 481 - 496 | - FERNANDES et al., Oncology Reports, (20050000), vol. 13, pages 943 - 947 | - DA FONSECA et al., Surgical Neurology, (20080000), vol. 70, page 259267 | - DA FONSECA et al., Arch. Immunol. Ther. Exp., (20080000), vol. 56, pages 267 - 276 | - HASHIZUME et al., Neuroncology, (20080000), vol. 10, pages 112 - 120 | - J. of Immunological Methods, (19830000), vol. 65, page 55 63 | - B. TEICHER, "Tumor Models for Efficacy Determination", Mol Cancer Ther, (20060000), vol. 5, pages 2435 - 2443 | - Sonderstrup, Springer, Sem. Immunopathol., (20030000), vol. 25, pages 35 - 45 | - NIKULA et al., Inhal. Toxicol., (20000000), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 123 - 53 |