EP3680564 - FILIGREE CEILING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERLUS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hauptstrasse 106 84088 Neufahrn / DE | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Jürgen c/o ERLUS Aktiengesellschaft Hauptstraße 106 84088 Neufahrn / DE | 02 /
Lanz, Holger Regensburger Straße 1a 85088 Vohburg / DE | 03 /
Schulte, Markus Rebenweg 12 84088 Neufahrn / DE | 04 /
Wimmer, Alexander Regensburger Straße 72 84061 Ergoldsbach / DE | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 20151533.5 | 13.01.2020 | [2020/29] | Priority number, date | DE201910100690 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019100690 | [2020/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680564 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3680564 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/08, F24F13/02, E04B5/32, E04B5/48 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
F24F13/0227 (EP);
E04B5/32 (EP);
E04B5/48 (EP);
F24F7/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | F24F7/08, F24F13/02, E04B5/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FILIGRANDECKE | [2020/29] | English: | FILIGREE CEILING | [2020/29] | French: | PLAFOND FILIGRANE | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 13.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | ES | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | IT | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | GR | 13.01.2023 | IE | 13.01.2023 | LU | 13.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | FR | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
IT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IE | 13.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IE | 13.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
LU | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 12.10.2022 | |
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1801852 (ODELGA DIPL ING PAUL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3245114 (KRAUS KRESZENTIA GEB HEICHELE [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * pages 1,14,15; figures 9, 10 *; | [Y]DE20315885U (WYRICH UWE [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0011] , [0017] - [0021]; figure 1 *; | [IAY]DE202005014803U (BINKERT GEORG [DE]) [I] 1-5,12-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0019]; figures 1, 2; claim 3 * [A] 8-11 [Y] 6,7; | [AD]DE102007010924 (BAUTEVENT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | DE102007010924 | DE102009020728 |