EP3689446 - AMMONIA DIFFUSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states RENAULT s.a.s. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubarry, Maxime Renault s.a.s. 4 rue Dunois 75013 PARIS / FR | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20151586.3 | 14.01.2020 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | FR20190000970 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: FR 1900970 | [2020/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689446 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3689446 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/02, B01F3/20, B01F5/04 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
B01F25/31331 (EP);
B01F23/12 (EP);
B01F23/711 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AMMONIAK-DIFFUSOR | [2020/32] | English: | AMMONIA DIFFUSER | [2020/32] | French: | DIFFUSEUR D'AMMONIAC | [2021/13] |
Former [2020/32] | DIFFUSEUR D AMMONIAC | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 26.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2020 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | ES | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | IT | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | MT | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | TR | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | IE | 14.01.2022 | LU | 14.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 14.01.2020 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
TR | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 14.01.2020 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003213234 (FUNK WERNER [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1975381 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0027]; figures 1,5,6 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] *; | [A]US2010170229 (VENGHAUS HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]FR3004755 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [AD] 13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102017201779 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0039]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP2428490 | FR3004755 |