EP3691310 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMORIYA, Mitsuo c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 20151628.3 | 14.01.2020 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | JP20190015981 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019015981 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691310 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/80, H04W12/00, H04W12/06, H04W52/02, // H04W88/06 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/50 (EP,KR);
H04W12/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04W12/50 (EP);
H04W48/16 (CN);
H04W48/18 (CN);
H04W52/0212 (CN);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W76/10 (CN);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/06 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/32] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2020/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 05.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017353981 (LEE MIN-GYU [KR], et al); | [X]US2018212936 (TERAO TSUYOSHI [JP]); | by applicant | JP2018042058 |