Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3670539 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3670539



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(47)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 471
16.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.12.2022 Claims Search / examination 2
16.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2022 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.12.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.12.2022 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.11.2022 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.11.2022 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.11.2022 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
02.11.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.10.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.10.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.10.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.08.2020 Change to the inventor details Search / examination 1
06.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.08.2020 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
29.06.2020 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
16.06.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.06.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.06.2020 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
29.05.2020 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2020 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.05.2020 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.04.2020 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.04.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.04.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 4
14.04.2020 European search report Search / examination 6
14.04.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
01.04.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
06.03.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.01.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.01.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.2020 Sequence listing Search / examination -
14.01.2020 Description Search / examination 104
14.01.2020 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2020 Drawings Search / examination 21
14.01.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
23.10.2017 Sequence listing Search / examination -
09.06.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 271