EP3851282 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN OFFSET PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland Goss web systems GmbH Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hänel, Jan St.-Florian-Straße 1a 86391 Stadtbergen / DE | 02 /
Hartmann, Peter Im Grohfuß 28A 55276 Oppenheim / DE | 03 /
Walser, Andreas Ganterweg 6 83661 Lenggries / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 20152247.1 | 16.01.2020 | [2021/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851282 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3851282 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/04, B41F33/00 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
B41F31/045 (EP);
B41F33/0027 (EP);
B41F33/0036 (EP);
B41F33/0045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] |
Former [2021/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER OFFSET-DRUCKMASCHINE | [2021/29] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN OFFSET PRINTING MACHINE | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE À IMPRIMER OFFSET | [2021/29] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 12.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102008041426 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0048]; figure 2 * |