EP3851577 - TRANSFER PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states vph GmbH & Co. KG Gutenbergstrasse 4 30966 Hemmingen / DE | For all designated states Rasmussen, Knud Villefrance Gimlesvej 2a 8600 Silkeborg / DK | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Knud Villefrance Gimlesvej 2a 8600 Silkeborg / DK | 02 /
KRAUSS, Stephan Dientzenhoferstrasse 22 90480 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 20152418.8 | 17.01.2020 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851577 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3851577 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/06, D21H19/34, D21H27/00, B41M3/12, B41M5/035, D06P5/24 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
D21H27/00 (EP);
B41M5/5236 (US);
B41M5/035 (US);
B41M5/0355 (EP);
B41M5/502 (US);
D06P1/50 (EP);
D06P3/52 (EP);
D06P5/004 (US);
D06P5/007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] |
Former [2021/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSFERPAPIER | [2021/29] | English: | TRANSFER PAPER | [2021/29] | French: | PAPIER DE TRANSFERT | [2021/29] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 06.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Observations by third parties | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Observations by third parties | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0006392 (SANDERS W A PAPIER [NL], et al); | [XI]US2017305178 (KUHNE LUTZ [DE], et al) | other | WO0006392 | US6805046 | US2017305178 |