Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
17.06.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2020 | Publication of search report | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 | Change - classification | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 | Change - classification | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
26.06.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
21.01.2020 | Change - representative |