Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3686097 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | A3 | EP3686097 | 29.07.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE202019000389 | 24.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202019000389U | 27.04.2020 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202019000389 | 24.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202020005457U | 20.04.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202019000389 | 24.01.2019 |