EP3686097 - TRIM ELEMENT FOR BICYCLE FRAME ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTI Sports GmbH Universitätsstrasse 2 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASCHE, Johannes Moosbergstrasse 35 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
GRAEVE, Arndt Schwester-Modesta-Strasse 40 56072 Koblenz / DE | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 20152804.9 | 21.01.2020 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | DE20192000389U | 24.01.2019 Original published format: DE 202019000389 U | [2020/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3686097 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3686097 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62J9/10, B62J9/12, B62K19/16, B62K7/00, B62K19/48, B62J17/00, B62K7/04, B62M6/55, B62M6/90 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B62J9/10 (EP);
B62J17/00 (EP);
B62J43/13 (EP);
B62J43/28 (EP);
B62J50/25 (EP);
B62J9/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | B62J9/10, B62J9/12, B62K19/16, B62K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKLEIDUNGSELEMENT FÜR FAHRRADRAHMENELEMENT | [2020/31] | English: | TRIM ELEMENT FOR BICYCLE FRAME ELEMENT | [2020/31] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE REVÊTEMENT POUR UN ÉLÉMENT DE CADRE DE BICYCLETTE | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/44] | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202017104098U (MULI-CYCLES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP1259417 (VELOTAXI GMBH BERLIN [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2,3; | [X]US2018141606 (OSADA TAD [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]CN203111374U (HU FANGYING) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102011103757 (HARTUNG ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]KR20160080646 (MANDO CORP [KR]) [X] 4-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0573716 (ROADMASTER CORP [US]) [X] 4-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US5249721 (BROOKS WILLIAM P [US]) [X] 4-9 * the whole document *; | [X]CN201002680Y (JIANBO LAI [CN]) [X] 4-9 * the whole document * |