EP3667166 - COMBUSTOR LINER PANEL END RAIL ANGLED COOLING INTERFACE PASSAGE FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMBUSTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUACH, San 183 Jude Lane Southington, CT Connecticut 06489 / US | 02 /
MORTON, Jeffrey T. 49 Olcott Drive Manchester, CT Connecticut 06040 / US | 03 /
PAREKH, Matthew D. 7 Saint Andrews Drive Farmington, CT Connecticut 06032 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 20152930.2 | 22.02.2018 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201715440739 | 23.02.2017 Original published format: US201715440739 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667166 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F23R3/50 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23R3/50 (EP,US);
F23R3/60 (US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
F05D2260/20 (US);
F23R2900/00017 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03041 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03042 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03043 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03044 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | ABGEWINKELTER KÜHLSCHNITTSTELLENDURCHGANG DER ENDSCHIENENKÜHLUNG VON BRENNKAMMERAUSKLEIDUNGSPLATTEN FÜR EINE GASTURBINENMOTORBRENNKAMMER | [2020/25] | English: | COMBUSTOR LINER PANEL END RAIL ANGLED COOLING INTERFACE PASSAGE FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMBUSTOR | [2020/25] | French: | PASSAGE D'INTERFACE DE REFROIDISSEMENT COUDÉ DE RAIL D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE PANNEAU DE CHEMISE DE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION POUR UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18158210.7 / EP3366996 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2298266 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,11* figures 2, 4 *; | [X]GB2317005 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1,11,12 * figures 1, 3; claim 1 *; | [XP]US2017184306 (TU JOHN S [US], et al) [XP] 1-8,11,12,14 * figures 1, 1C, 2, 3, 5 *; | [XPI]EP3211319 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [XP] 1-14 * figures 1-3 * [I] 15 |