Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
18.03.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.02.2021 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.07.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
16.05.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.01.2020 | Change - representative |