Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023323298 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916719650 | 18.12.2019 | US201715532921 | 02.06.2017 | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | US202318158146 | 23.01.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020140816 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715532921 | 02.06.2017 | US201916719625 | 18.12.2019 | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11566222 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2023 | B2 | US2020123502 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916719650 | 18.12.2019 | US201715532921 | 02.06.2017 | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10557117 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2020 | B2 | US2017342381 | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102686005B | Global Dossier | 17.07.2024 | B1 | KR20170084337 | 19.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6802159B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2020 | B2 | JP2017537625 | 21.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3227435 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2020 | B1 | EP3227435 | 11.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107208061 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2969783 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2023 | C | CA2969783 | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015356788B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2021 | B2 | AU2015356788 | 13.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3696263 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15819849 | 04.12.2015 | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3227435T | 04.05.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017007214 | 30.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2017121191 | 29.07.2019 | A3 | RU2017121191 | 10.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201704499 | 25.09.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2015GB53713 | 04.12.2015 | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016087871 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201421716D0 | 21.01.2015 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201421716 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Earlier application | EP3227435 |