blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3855141

EP3855141 - METHOD, APPARATUS FOR TERMPERATURE DETECTION AND WEARABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2022
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2022  [2022/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 52
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2021/30]
Inventor(s)01 / CAO, Xue Ming
c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual
Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / KONG, Tao
c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual
Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / GU, Wale
c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual
Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / CHEN, Weizhong
c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual
Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2021/30]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 52
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2021/30]Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date20153292.623.01.2020
[2021/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3855141
Date:28.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2020
ClassificationIPC:G01J5/06, G01J5/02, G01J5/00, G01J5/20, A62B18/00, G01K1/20
[2021/30]
CPC:
G01J5/0096 (EP); G01J5/025 (EP); G01J5/026 (EP);
G01J5/06 (EP); G01J5/20 (EP); G01K7/42 (EP);
A62B18/006 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEMPERATURERFASSUNG UND WEARABLE-VORRICHTUNG[2021/30]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS FOR TERMPERATURE DETECTION AND WEARABLE DEVICE[2021/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE TEMPÉRATURE ET DISPOSITIF VESTIMENTAIRE[2021/30]
Examination procedure29.01.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/28]
21.02.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2022/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.202203   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2014321503  (NIEDERBERGER DOMINIK [CH], et al) [X] 1,6,9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 10;
 [IY]EP2728327  (SENSIRION AG [CH]) [I] 1,6,9,10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 11-15;
 [IY]US2018245986  (PAN CHI-WEN [TW], et al) [I] 1,6,9,10 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * pages 1, 6 * [Y] 11-15;
 [IY]EP3062077  (NXP BV [NL]) [I] 1,6,9,10 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 11-15;
 [IY]US2011205071  (NAMEKAWA KIMIYASU [JP], et al) [I] 1,6,9,10 * paragraphs [0055] , [0 66] - [0074] - [ 107] * * figures 4-8 * [Y] 11-15;
 [Y]WO2019025374  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 11-15 * page 8, paragraph 20 - page 11, paragraph 25 * * figures 2, 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.